+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Cities & Counties Subcommittee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/23/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/16/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 10, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor