+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 249
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 5
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3