+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Failed in Education Administration & Planning
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/11/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/21/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/14/2017
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2017: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Failed in Education Administration & Planning
April 11, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING COMMITTEE: Failed in Education Administration & Planning
March 28, 2017: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 28, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor