+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 94
- Effective date(s) 03/28/2019
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 2, PNV 2
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 56, Nays 28, PNV 4
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/26/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (7)
March 14, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 7, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 7, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 4