+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/17/2021
- Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/17/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/10/2021
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 17, 2021: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor