+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/5/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 1/30/2014
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 1/28/2014
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 1/21/2014
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to the Department of Education
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/5/2013
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
January 28, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
January 21, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor