+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 190
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/31/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/17/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/10/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
April 9, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 9, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 9, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 31, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 31, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 31, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 25, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 25, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 25, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 17, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 17, 2015: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor