+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Civil Justice Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Education
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 26, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor