+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor