+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 89
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/18/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2015
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 18, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 18, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 10, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
March 10, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor