+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor