+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 49
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/8/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 8, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor