+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 237
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (9)
April 8, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 33