+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 152
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/14/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/7/2017
- Roll 8 places
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Government Operations for Review
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 3, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 3, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 22, 2017: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 22, 2017: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 14, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 14, 2017: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 7, 2017: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 7, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor