+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 325
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 1
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0132)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 63, Nays 31
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/13/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0132
Amendment 1-0 to HB0306
+ − Votes (7)
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Kelsey
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Kelsey
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 20
March 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 2
March 21, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 13, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 5, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor