+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 227
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/22/2017
- Meeting Cancelled. Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/22/17
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/15/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (10)
April 17, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 11, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 11, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 5, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 5, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 22, 2017: HOUSE BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 22, 2017: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 7, 2017: HOUSE BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
March 7, 2017: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor