+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 759
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 6/17/2020
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
- Approved by Delayed Bills Comm.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 6/1/2020
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
June 15, 2020: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE:
June 15, 2020: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor