+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On June 8, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0749)
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 6/5/2020
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 8, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
June 8, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
June 5, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to
May 28, 2020: HOUSE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 10, 2020: HOUSE K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor