+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 03/29/2021
- Pub. Ch. 74
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/8/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/22/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 4
March 4, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar
February 22, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor