+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor