+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Held on desk.
On May 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to recede from amendment
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment #1
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0687)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0671)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/18/2020
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 18, 2020: HOUSE PUBLIC SERVICE & EMPLOYEES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
March 18, 2020: HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (13)
C. Sexton
Type:
Primary Sponsor