+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor