+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
June 10, 2020: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 27, 2020: HOUSE CONSTITUTIONAL PROTECTIONS & SENTENCING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor