+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0934)
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/11/2020
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- Ref. to Judiciary
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
June 17, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88