+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Committee to 6/4/2020
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: HOUSE HIGHER EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor