+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Pr. Ch. 58
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018
- Move to Heel
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2018
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/17/2018
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/16/2018
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
April 23, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
April 18, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 18, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 17, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor