+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2018
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/10/2018
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 10, 2018: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 10, 2018: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor