+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1025)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1016)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0781)
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/15/2020
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/9/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY WHITSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY WHITSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
June 17, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
June 15, 2020: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
June 15, 2020: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
June 9, 2020: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
June 2, 2020: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 10, 2020: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor