+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/4/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2020: HOUSE LOCAL COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 25, 2020: HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor