+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/9/2013
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/9/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/3/2013
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/2/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to the SRO Calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 26, 2013: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor