+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled. Reset on Public Health Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: HOUSE PUBLIC HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor