+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 244
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0268)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0083)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/6/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
April 18, 2019: SEN. FLOOR SESSION: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 87
March 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87