+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 1063
- Effective date(s) 05/21/2018
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 1
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1006)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1122)
- Move to Heel
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1222)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 4/17/2018
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2018
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/16/18
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
- Intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 18, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 11
April 17, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 17, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 16, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 16, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 16, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 16, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor