+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 965
- Effective date(s) 05/15/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0854)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0845)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/14/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
- Intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 23, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 22, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 22, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92