+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 943
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar
- Move to Heel
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Move to Heel
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
- Intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
April 17, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 11, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 11, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 11, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 11, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 27, 2018: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 27, 2018: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 21, 2018: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
March 21, 2018: HOUSE HEATH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor