+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 71
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/20/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/1/2017
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 16, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar
March 16, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar
March 1, 2017: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 1, 2017: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor