+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/30/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 22, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor