+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 710
- Effective date(s) 06/22/2020
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0617)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0619)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/4/2020
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/26/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
June 11, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
June 3, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
June 2, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 4, 2020: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 26, 2020: HOUSE CHILDREN & FAMILIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor