+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 72, Nays 20, PNV 2
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0748)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0740)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/27/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
- Roll 1 places
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/21/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- Reassigned to Civil Justice Committee
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
- Intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 5, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 27
March 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 27
March 5, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 27, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 27, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 21, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
February 21, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (22)
VanHuss
Type:
Primary Sponsor