+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 787
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/23/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/16/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
March 22, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 5
March 16, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 5
March 8, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 5