+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 985
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2022
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2022
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro.
- Sponsor change.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 18, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 6, 2022: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 30, 2022: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor