+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 59
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/26/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 2/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/13/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0027
Amendment 1-0 to HB0258