+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
- Move to Heel
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
- Intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
February 28, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor