+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor