+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 1019
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/24/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/16/2016
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (7)
April 18, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 31
March 17, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
March 17, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 8, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 2, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 24, 2016: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 16, 2016: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor