+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 713
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/9/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.