+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 41
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar 3/15/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/8/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar
March 8, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor