+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 5/26/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to BEP Review Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor