+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pr. Ch. 68
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1286)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Passed S., Ayes 28, Nays 0
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/15/2014
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA1286
Amendment 1-0 to HB2546
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 15, 2014: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor