+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
- Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/20/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor